Knoll, Franklin J. "Frank"
House 1974-76 (District 61A); Senate 1977-82 (District 61)
Party when first elected: Nonpartisan Election-Liberal Caucus
Counties Served:
Hennepin
BIOGRAPHICAL INFORMATION
Date of Birth:
4/30/1940
Birth Place:
Saint Cloud, Minnesota
Birth County:
Birth Country:
United States
Date of Death:
5/18/2023
Gender:
Male
Religion:
Catholic
Reported Minority: None Reported
Other Names:
Frank
City of Residence (when first elected):
Minneapolis
Occupation (when first elected):
Attorney, Hennepin County Public Defender
EDUCATION
St. John's Preparatory School, Collegeville, Minnesota; Secondary;
St. John's University, Collegeville, Minnesota; B.A.; Chemistry and Biology, 1962
University of Minnesota, Law School; J.D.; 1966
Harvard University, Law School; Fellowship; Bush Leadership Fellow; Summer, 1978
OTHER GOVERNMENT SERVICE
Military:
United States Navy Reserve (Lieutenant);
19?? to ?
State Public Defender/Office:
Hennepin County, Minnesota (Assistant Public Defender);
19?? to 19??
Judge:
Hennepin County Minnesota, Judicial District Court (District Judge);
1984 to ?
[Appointed]
FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS
Spouse:
Margot (married in 1965)
Children:
Three children: Elizabeth, Caroline, and Jonathan
Family Members Who Have Served in the Minnesota Legislature:
GENERAL NOTES
Special Legislative Concerns: housing, minority and small business concerns, criminal justice, handicapped.
He was a member of the Democratic-Farmer-Labor Party.
Religion provided by the Catholic Bulletin, 3/21/1975.
Body: Senate
District: 61
Elected: 11/4/1980
Residence: Minneapolis
Term of Office: 1/6/1981 to 1/3/1983
Counties Represented:
Hennepin
Occupation: Attorney, Assistant Hennepin County Public Defender
Party:
Democratic-Farmer-Labor
Committees:
-
Finance
-
Finance: State Departments
-
Governmental Operations (Chair)
-
Governmental Operations: Structure
- Ex Officio Member
-
Judiciary
-
Judiciary: Criminal Law
-
Judiciary: Real Estate Law
-
Rules and Administration
Body: Senate
District: 61
Elected: 11/2/1976
Residence: Minneapolis
Term of Office: 1/4/1977 to 1/5/1981
Counties Represented:
Hennepin
Occupation: Attorney, Assistant Hennepin County Public Defender
Party:
Democratic-Farmer-Labor
Committees:
-
Energy and Housing
-
Energy and Housing: Housing (Chair)
-
Finance
-
Finance: State Departments
-
Governmental Operations
-
Governmental Operations: Civil Administration Regulatory Reform-1980
-
Governmental Operations: Metropolitan Affairs-1979
-
Governmental Operations: Metropolitan Government-1980
-
Judiciary
-
Judiciary: Judicial Administration
-
Judiciary: Privacy
Body: Senate
District: 61
Elected: 11/2/1976
Residence: Minneapolis
Term of Office: 1/4/1977 to 1/5/1981
Counties Represented:
Hennepin
Occupation: Attorney
Party:
Democratic-Farmer-Labor
Committees:
-
Energy and Housing
-
Energy and Housing: Housing (Chair)
-
Governmental Operations
-
Governmental Operations: Metro Affairs (Chair)
-
Judiciary
-
Judiciary: Judicial Administration
Body: House
District: 61A
Elected: 11/5/1974
Residence: Minneapolis
Term of Office: 1/7/1975 to 1/3/1977
Counties Represented:
Hennepin
Occupation: Attorney, Hennepin County Public Defender
Party:
Democratic-Farmer-Labor
Committees:
-
Crime Prevention and Corrections
-
Governmental Operations
-
Judiciary
Body: House
District: 61A
Elected: 11/6/1973
Residence: Minneapolis
Term of Office: 11/14/1973 to 1/6/1975
(Special Election)
Counties Represented:
Hennepin
Occupation: Attorney, Hennepin County Public Defender
Party:
Nonpartisan Election-Liberal Caucus
Committees:
Session Notes:
He won the seat vacated by Gary Flakne.
Articles & Books About
"Knoll, Franklin J." Star Tribune, May 21, 2023, p. B10.
These files are available in the Legislative Reference Library.
The Minnesota Legislative Reference Library has collected newspaper articles on legislators since 1973. They are available in the Library.