Connell, John
House 1927-34 (District 11)
Party when first elected: Nonpartisan Election
Counties Served:
Rock
BIOGRAPHICAL INFORMATION
Date of Birth:
??/??/1874
Birth Place:
Yankton, South Dakota
Birth County:
Birth Country:
United States
Date of Death:
Gender:
Male
Religion:
Episcopalian
Reported Minority: None Reported
Other Names:
City of Residence (when first elected):
Luverne
Occupation (when first elected):
Drug Store Owner
EDUCATION
Yankton College, South Dakota; Attended College; 3 years
South Dakota State College of Pharmacy; College Graduate;
OTHER GOVERNMENT SERVICE
Municipal Mayor:
Luverne, Minnesota (2 terms);
1??? to 192?
FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS
Spouse:
Laura E. Hinkly (married in 1905)
Children:
Two children (living); (1 son, 1 daughter)
Family Members Who Have Served in the Minnesota Legislature:
GENERAL NOTES
He was raised on a farm.
Religion provided by the Minnesota Legislative Manual, 1927.
Elected: 11/8/1932
Residence: Luverne
Term of Office: 1/3/1933 to 1/7/1935
Counties Represented:
Rock
Occupation: Drug Business
Party:
Nonpartisan Election
Committees:
-
Appropriations
-
Civil Administration
-
Commerce, Manufacture and Retail Trade
-
Public Health and Hospitals (Chair)
-
Public Welfare and Social Legislation
-
University and State Schools
Elected: 11/4/1930
Residence: Luverne
Term of Office: 1/6/1931 to 1/2/1933
Counties Represented:
Rock
Occupation: Drug Business
Party:
Nonpartisan Election
Committees:
-
Education
-
Motor Vehicles and Motor Tax Laws
-
Municipal Affairs
-
Printing and Publishing (Chair)
-
Public Health and Hospitals
-
Public Welfare and Social Legislation
-
Taxes and Tax Laws
Elected: 11/6/1928
Residence: Luverne
Term of Office: 1/8/1929 to 1/5/1931
Counties Represented:
Rock
Occupation: Drug Business
Party:
Nonpartisan Election
Committees:
-
Education
-
Engrossment and Enrollment
-
Labor
-
Motor Vehicles and Motor Tax Laws
-
Municipal Affairs
-
Public Health and Hospitals
-
Public Welfare and Social Legislation
Elected: 11/2/1926
Residence: Luverne
Term of Office: 1/4/1927 to 1/7/1929
Counties Represented:
Rock
Occupation: Drug Store Owner
Party:
Nonpartisan Election
Committees:
-
Commerce, Manufacture and Retail Trade
-
Crime Prevention
-
Engrossment and Enrollment
-
Labor
-
Public Health and Hospitals
-
Public Welfare and Social Legislation
No other information has been entered for this legislator.
These files are available in the Legislative Reference Library.