Remore, J. F.
Senate 1877-78 (District 7)
Party when first elected: Republican
Counties Served:
Winona
BIOGRAPHICAL INFORMATION
Date of Birth:
??/??/1826
Birth Place:
New York
Birth County:
Birth Country:
United States
Date of Death:
Gender:
Male
Religion:
Reported Minority: None Reported
Other Names:
City of Residence (when first elected):
Saint Charles
Occupation (when first elected):
Liveryman
EDUCATION
OTHER GOVERNMENT SERVICE
Municipal Mayor:
St. Charles, Minnesota (City Mayor, 2 terms);
18?? to 18??
Municipal Council/Aldermen:
St. Charles, Minnesota (City Alderman);
18?? to 18??
FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS
Spouse:
Married
Children:
Family Members Who Have Served in the Minnesota Legislature:
GENERAL NOTES
He moved to Wisconsin in 1846. He came to Minnesota in 1856.
He was one of the founders of the city of St. Charles, Minnesota (Biographical Sketches of the Officers of Minnesota and the 19th Minnesota State Legislature by C.L. Hall, 1877)
He "was early identified with the Republican party, and sees no cause at this day to forsake it." (Biographical Sketches of the Officers of Minnesota and the 19th Minnesota State Legislature by C.L. Hall, 1877, p. 19)
He was listed as a Republican on the list of members posted after the 1877 election. ("The Next Legislature." St. Paul Pioneer Press, November 10, 1877)
Body: Senate
District: 07
Elected: 11/7/1876
Residence: Saint Charles
Term of Office: 1/2/1877 to 1/6/1879
Counties Represented:
Winona
Occupation: Agent
Party:
Republican
Party Notes: He "was early identified with the Republican party, and sees no cause at this day to forsake it." (Biographical Sketches of the Officers of Minnesota and the 19th Minnesota State Legislature by C.L. Hall, 1877, p. 19); He was listed as a Republican on the list of members posted after the 1877 election. ("The Next Legislature." St. Paul Pioneer Press, November 10, 1877)
Committees:
-
Claims
-
Engrossment (Chair)
-
Internal Improvements
-
Soldiers Orphans (Chair)
Body: Senate
District: 07
Elected: 11/7/1876
Residence: Saint Charles
Term of Office: 1/2/1877 to 1/6/1879
Counties Represented:
Winona
Occupation: Liveryman
Party:
Republican
Party Notes: He "was early identified with the Republican party, and sees no cause at this day to forsake it." (Biographical Sketches of the Officers of Minnesota and the 19th Minnesota State Legislature by C.L. Hall, 1877, p. 19); He was listed as a Republican on the list of members posted after the 1877 election. ("The Next Legislature." St. Paul Pioneer Press, November 10, 1877)
Committees:
-
Claims
-
Engrossment
-
Enrollment
-
Internal Improvements
-
Public Buildings
-
Soldiers Orphans (Chair)