Kamrath, Randy P.
Senate 1981-86 (District 20)
Party when first elected: Independent Republican
Counties Served:
Chippewa, Lac Qui Parle, Lincoln, Lyon, Redwood, Swift, Yellow Medicine
BIOGRAPHICAL INFORMATION
Date of Birth:
5/23/1954
Birth Place:
Canby, Minnesota
Birth County:
Yellow Medicine
Birth Country:
United States
Date of Death:
Gender:
Male
Religion:
Lutheran
Reported Minority: None Reported
Other Names:
City of Residence (when first elected):
Canby
Occupation (when first elected):
Farmer
EDUCATION
University of Minnesota, Twin Cities; Attended College; St. Paul Campus (Didn't Graduate)
OTHER GOVERNMENT SERVICE
FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS
Spouse:
Single (while in office); Susan Dosland (married in 1987)
Children:
Four children (after he left office): Paige, McKenzie, Benjamin, and William
Family Members Who Have Served in the Minnesota Legislature:
William B. Dosland
- Father-in-Law
GENERAL NOTES
Special Legislative Concerns: agriculture, taxes and business climate, education.
He ran unsuccessfully as the Independent Republican Party endorsed candidate for the Minnesota Senate in the 1986 election. His opponent, David J. Frederickson, defeated him by 45 votes so an automatic recount occurred. The recount confirmed that David J. Frederickson had won.
Religion provided by his daughter.
Body: Senate
District: 20
Elected: 11/2/1982
Residence: Canby
Term of Office: 1/4/1983 to 1/5/1987
Counties Represented:
Chippewa, Lac Qui Parle, Redwood, Swift, Yellow Medicine
Occupation: Farmer
Party:
Independent Republican
Committees:
-
Education
-
Education: Joint Senate/House Subcommittee on Libraries
-
Education: Post-Secondary and Higher Education
-
Energy and Housing
-
Energy and Housing: Housing
-
Judiciary
-
Judiciary: Judicial Administration
-
Local and Urban Government
-
Local and Urban Government: Local Government
Ran in next election? Yes. Defeated in general election
Body: Senate
District: 20
Elected: 11/2/1982
Residence: Canby
Term of Office: 1/4/1983 to 1/5/1987
Counties Represented:
Chippewa, Lac Qui Parle, Redwood, Swift, Yellow Medicine
Occupation: Farmer
Party:
Independent Republican
Committees:
-
Education
-
Education: Joint House/Senate Subcommittee on Libraries
-
Education: Post-Secondary and Higher Education
-
Energy and Housing
-
Energy and Housing: Housing
-
Judiciary
-
Judiciary: Judicial Administration
-
Local and Urban Government
-
Local and Urban Government: Local Government
Body: Senate
District: 20
Elected: 5/12/1981
Residence: Canby
Term of Office: 5/15/1981 to 1/3/1983
(Special Election)
Counties Represented:
Chippewa, Lac Qui Parle, Lincoln, Lyon, Yellow Medicine
Occupation: Farmer
Party:
Independent Republican
Committees:
Session Notes:
He won the Senate special election held due to the resignation of James Nichols. He was sworn in on May 15, 1981.
Senate Photos
The photos in this collection were scanned from the files of the Minnesota Senate Photographer
with the generous help of the Minnesota
Digital Library.
These files are available in the Legislative Reference Library.
The Minnesota Legislative Reference Library has collected newspaper articles on legislators since 1973. They are available in the Library.